Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Greer, Wendy, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Hays, Cody Wyatt, Critz, Robin Danielle, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Neill, John E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 26, 2015 |
CategorySupport Order - Iv-D |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeAll Other Dispositions |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Conine, Casey Raymond)
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
(LAC) Intervention Attorney General of Texas Attorney General of Texas Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
April 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Returned EXECUTED 4-16-2020 EXECUTED 4-16-2020 Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
April 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned EXECUTED 4-16-2020 EXECUTED 4-16-2020 Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
March 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Interim Temporary Orders in SMPCR - emailed in SMPCR - emailed Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Hewlett, Sydney B) Result: Held
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Critz, Robin Danielle Unserved Hays, Cody Wyatt Unserved
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Issued - emailed atty - emailed atty Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Issued - emailed to atty - emailed to atty Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Other CANCELED Temporary (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Hewlett, Sydney B) Other Judge: Neill, John E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.