Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Leija, Eligio Adame, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Montemayor, Virginia, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Neill, John E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 15, 2015 |
CategoryAll Other Family Law Matters |
Last RefreshedSeptember 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order In Suit To Modify Parent-Child Relationship - sent to court Order In Suit To Modify Parent-Child Relationship - sent to court Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order In Suit To Modify Parent-Child Relationship Order In Suit To Modify Parent-Child Relationship Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion to Retain Case on Docket
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Docket (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Weeks, John Wilson, Weeks, John Wilson) Result: Held
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter to Court - Requesting Final Hearing - sent - Requesting Final Hearing - sent Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Retain Case on Docket - sent to court - sent to court Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice - Dismissal - Case - David Houston - *Coordinator sent* - David Houston - *Coordinator sent* Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice - Dismissal - Case - Tommy Altaras - *Coordinator sent* - Tommy Altaras - *Coordinator sent* Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing Agreed Resolution CANCELED Final Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officers Hewlett, Sydney B, Hewlett, Sydney B) Agreed Resolution Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Setting Hearing 6-17-21
Judge: Neill, John E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.