Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Department Of Family And Protective Services, filed a(n) Child Protection - Family case against Taylor, Mickey Ray, Jr., Graham-Fulton, Charie Chantell, Fulton, Leonard, Ii, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bridewell, Wayne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBridewell, Wayne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 28, 2015 |
CategoryChild Protective Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Protection |
Case Outcome TypeCases Non-Suited Or Dismissed By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry ****** Scan Box 2670 ****** ****** Scan Box 2670 ****** Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Attorney Pay Sheet
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice /Order (emailed to all attys) /Order (emailed to all attys) Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Result: Held
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Bailiff's Certificate of Call
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Order to Dismiss Order to Dismiss Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Discharge of CASA of Johnson County Order Order Granting Discharge of CASA of Johnson County Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem of Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
October 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Attorney Pay Sheet
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.