Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Barrett, Joan Elizabeth, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Hansard, Sonny E, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts 18th District Court with Casey Conine presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCasey Conine Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 27, 2015 |
CategorySupport Order - Iv-D |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court House18th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Conine, Casey Raymond) | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Court Proceeding - Hrg 3/19/24 - Hrg 3/19/24 |
|
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Conine, Casey Raymond) | |
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Hearing (phone hearing) - *emailed AG (phone hearing) - *emailed AG |
|
April 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Conine, Casey Raymond) | |
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders Order Confirming and Modifying Support Obligation; Contempt Reserved Order Confirming and Modifying Support Obligation; Contempt Reserved |
|
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Conine, Casey Raymond) | |
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation Duplicate Service Return - Sonny E. Hansard Duplicate Service Return - Sonny E. Hansard |
|
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Precept Duplicate Service Return - Sonny E. Hansard Duplicate Service Return - Sonny E. Hansard |
|
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Citation Returned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.