Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Davis, Dwan L., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Davis, Nichole L., in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Neill, John E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNeill, John E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 20, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry ****************scan box 2328***************** ****************scan box 2328***************** Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
June 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
June 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
June 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Neill, John E.) Result: Held
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
June 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice SENT TO NICOLE DAVIS, MICHAEL KURMES SENT TO NICOLE DAVIS, MICHAEL KURMES Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
June 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
June 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Letter to sharon powell-sent to court Letter Letter to sharon powell-sent to court Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Citation ret served-filed 4-27-15 ret served-filed 4-27-15 Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Citation Davis, Nichole L. Served 04/23/2015 Returned 04/27/2015
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original petition for divorce-iss cit/ret Original petition for divorce-iss cit/ret Judge: Neill, John E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.