Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Anderson, Cynthia Diane, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Anderson, Gregory Dell, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bosworth, William C, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBosworth, William C, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 17, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry Nunc Pro Tunc Final Decree Of Divorce To Correct W-9 And W-10 Nunc Pro Tunc Final Decree Of Divorce To Correct W-9 And W-10 Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry ******************scan box 2332*************** ******************scan box 2332*************** Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Result: Held
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice /Decree (Michael Kurmes & Tim Altaras) /Decree (Michael Kurmes & Tim Altaras) Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Letter from Shellky Fowler re: Anderson Mediation- Successful from Shellky Fowler re: Anderson Mediation- Successful Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
June 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Mediated Settlement Agreement
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order of Referral to Mediation
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Temporary (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Dean, Keith) Result: Held
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.