Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Esquivel, Catalina, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Esquivel, Josue, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bridewell, Wayne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBridewell, Wayne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed No Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry ****************************** SCAN BOX 2502 *************************** ****************************** SCAN BOX 2502 *************************** Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice /order (sent to Catalina Esquivel) /order (sent to Catalina Esquivel) Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Docket (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Result: Dismissed
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Letter mailed to Catalina Esquivel mailed to Catalina Esquivel Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry Civil Info Sheet Civil Info Sheet Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) for Divorce for Divorce Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.