Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mccullough, Raymond, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mccullough, Judith M. Lounsberry, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Cooke, C.C. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Cooke, C.C. |
|
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Decree-Raymond McCullough & Judith McCullough Decree-Raymond McCullough & Judith McCullough Judge: Cooke, C.C. |
|
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry ***************Scan Box 2283***************** ***************Scan Box 2283***************** Judge: Cooke, C.C. |
|
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Cooke, C.C.) Result: Held
Judge: Cooke, C.C. |
|
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Letter from Gina Horton setting final hearing for 3-23-15 from Gina Horton setting final hearing for 3-23-15 Judge: Cooke, C.C. |
|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Letter with Final Decree of Divorce-Requesting final hearing-sent to court with Final Decree of Divorce-Requesting final hearing-sent to court Judge: Cooke, C.C. |
|
January 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer ret from court ret from court Judge: Cooke, C.C. |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) for Divorce for Divorce Judge: Cooke, C.C. |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Indigency (Needs Approval or Contested) (Needs Approval or Contested) Judge: Cooke, C.C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.