Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jones, Toni Marshall, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Jordan, Sharon Diane, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Neill, John E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2014 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeCases Non-Suited Or Dismissed By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry *****************scan box 2295**************** *****************scan box 2295**************** Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
April 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
April 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice SENT TO ROBERT LUTTRELL, SHARON JORDAN SENT TO ROBERT LUTTRELL, SHARON JORDAN Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order of Non-Suit SIGNED SIGNED Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Granting Nonsuit - sent to court Order Granting Nonsuit - sent to court Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Suit
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Neill, John E.)
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
February 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Letter from Robert Luttrell hrg set 3-2-15 from Robert Luttrell hrg set 3-2-15 Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Letter Requesting Prove-Up Hearing Requesting Prove-Up Hearing Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service Sharon Diane Jordan Sharon Diane Jordan Judge: Neill, John E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.