Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
All State Properties Inc, filed a(n) Contract - Other case represented by Kristina B. Dial, against Thompson, Janet, Thompson, Clarence William, Iii, represented by Christopher C Cooke, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Sydney B. Hewlett presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hewlett, Sydney B) | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion To Enter (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officers Hewlett, Sydney B, Hewlett, Sydney B) Docket Control Order Docket Control Order |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Docket Control Order Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Docket Control Order |
|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Docket Control Order - sent to court Motion Motion for Docket Control Order - sent to court |
|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing Other CANCELED Final Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officers Hewlett, Sydney B, Hewlett, Sydney B) Other |
|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Continue Other CANCELED Motion to Continue (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officers Hewlett, Sydney B, Hewlett, Sydney B) Other |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Continuance - Agreed Order for Continuance - Agreed Order for Continuance |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance Defendant's Motion for Continuance - sent to court Defendant's Motion for Continuance - sent to court |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendant Janet Thompson's Original Answer Defendant Janet Thompson's Original Answer |
|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance and Notice of Hearing-Sent to Court Motion for Continuance Motion for Continuance and Notice of Hearing-Sent to Court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.