Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Taylor Thomas, against Maki, Robert S, represented by Martin A Rechnitzer, Esquire, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2019 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion -Plaintifffs Motion to Retain and Trial Setting Request-Sent to court via queue -Plaintifffs Motion to Retain and Trial Setting Request-Sent to court via queue |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order -Order-Sent to court via queue -Order-Sent to court via queue |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Letter Taylor Thomas/Martin A Rechitzer Esquire Taylor Thomas/Martin A Rechitzer Esquire |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Filing of Pleadings - Sent to court via que Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Filing of Pleadings - Sent to court via que |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Answer - Defendant's Original Answer - Defendant's Original Answer |
|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned - EXECUTED 12-28-2019 - EXECUTED 12-28-2019 |
|
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter for Filing - ABC Legal for Filing - ABC Legal |
|
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) - Plaintiff's Original Petition - Iss Cit(+copies) - Plaintiff's Original Petition - Iss Cit(+copies) |
|
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued - mailed to ABC Legal - mailed to ABC Legal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.