Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
James Hardie Building Products, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bradley Allen Waters, against Dang, John Tai, Md, Dang Medical Clinic, P.A., Dang Occupational Consultants, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bosworth, William C, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2018 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeCases Non-Suited Or Dismissed By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Scan Box *****SCAN BOX 3350***** *****SCAN BOX 3350***** Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice/Order emailed emailed Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Nonsuit Order Granting Pltf James Hardie Bldg Products, Inc.'s Notice of Non-Suit Without Prejudice Order Granting Pltf James Hardie Bldg Products, Inc.'s Notice of Non-Suit Without Prejudice Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit Without Prejudice Plaintiff James Hardie Building Products, Inc's Notice of Non-Suit Without Prejudice - sent to court via que Plaintiff James Hardie Building Products, Inc's Notice of Non-Suit Without Prejudice - sent to court via que Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Letter to Coordinator
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Letter to Coordinator
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Letter from Court regarding courts ruling on Tort Claims regarding courts ruling on Tort Claims Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Ancillary to Temporary Injunction Order Ancillary to Temporary Injunction Order Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Bailiff's Certificate of Call
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.