Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hankins, Hailey Rose, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Neill, John E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment/Non Jury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Scan Box ****SCAN BOX 2991**** ****SCAN BOX 2991**** Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
February 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
February 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice sent sent Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Changing the Name of an Adult
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Adult Name Change (4:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Neill, John E.) Result: Held
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter Setting Hearing 2-15-18 @4P 2-15-18 @4P Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter Requesting Hearing - Sent to Court - Sent to Court Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certification of Criminal History Record Information
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Petition to Change the Name of an Adult Petition to Change the Name of an Adult Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Information Sheet
Judge: Neill, John E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.