Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Zatlo, Marvin, Zatlo, Linda, Wallis, James, Wallis, Debbie, Jones, Peggie, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Jeffrey S Davis, against The City Of Joshua, Texas, represented by Robert F. Brown, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Neill, John E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2017 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeAll Other Dispositions |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Scan Box ****SCAN BOX 3157**** ****SCAN BOX 3157**** Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Plea to the Jurisdiction Order Order Granting Plea to the Jurisdiction Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Plea to Jurisdiction (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Neill, John E.) Result: Held
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Brief Defendant City of Joshua's Brief in Support of The City's Plea to the Jurisdiction Defendant City of Joshua's Brief in Support of The City's Plea to the Jurisdiction Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Brief Defendant City of Joshua's Brief in Response of Plaintiff's Request for Temporary Injunction Defendant City of Joshua's Brief in Response of Plaintiff's Request for Temporary Injunction Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing on Appl for Temp Injunction & Plea to the Jurisdiction - emailed on Appl for Temp Injunction & Plea to the Jurisdiction - emailed Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter to Court Coordinator Letter Letter to Court Coordinator Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter Confirming Hearing -sent to court via que-ret -sent to court via que-ret Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order
Judge: Neill, John E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.