Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hash, Sharon Kay, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bridewell, Wayne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2017 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment/Non Jury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Scan Box ****SCAN BOX 2999**** ****SCAN BOX 2999**** Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice sent sent Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Adult Name Change (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Result: Held
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Changing the Name of an Adult
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Adult Name Change (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Result: Held
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter Setting Hearing
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter Requesting Hearing
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certification of Criminal History Record Information
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
December 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Information Sheet
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.