Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mahan Wright, against Maher, Megan, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bridewell, Wayne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBridewell, Wayne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Granting Default Judgment-Sent to Court Order Granting Default Judgment-Sent to Court Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
June 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry ******SCAN BOX 2773****** ******SCAN BOX 2773****** Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice /Jmt (emailed atty, sent to deft) /Jmt (emailed atty, sent to deft) Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Bailiff's Certificate of Call
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Default hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officers Isaacks, Vicki, Isaacks, Vicki) 05/17/2017 Reset by Court to 06/02/2017 Result: Other
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Motion Motion for Default Judgment Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Executed 2/27/17 Executed 2/27/17 Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.