Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Baldridge, Mariana, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by John W. Pate, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Neill, John E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 09, 2015 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Other Injury Or Damage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeAll Other Dispositions |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Ret Mail- Not deliverable as addressed-unable to fwd Ret Mail- Not deliverable as addressed-unable to fwd Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Depo of Written Questions REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION DEPOSITION OF CHAD EDWARD HUTCHINSON DECEMBER 8, 2015 REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION DEPOSITION OF CHAD EDWARD HUTCHINSON DECEMBER 8, 2015 Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry ***************SCAN BOX 2454**************** ***************SCAN BOX 2454**************** Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice SENT TO JOHN PATE SENT TO JOHN PATE Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order on Petition to Take Oral Depositiion Under Rule 202 to Investigate Potential Claim on Petition to Take Oral Depositiion Under Rule 202 to Investigate Potential Claim Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Hearing (4:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Neill, John E.) Result: Held
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
October 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Petition For Order Authorizing the Taking of Oral Deposition Under Rule 202 to Investigate Potential Claim/Notice of Hearing Petition For Order Authorizing the Taking of Oral Deposition Under Rule 202 to Investigate Potential Claim/Notice of Hearing Judge: Neill, John E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.