Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, Na, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mark Rechner, against Roca, Silvia C., in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bosworth, William C, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBosworth, William C, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 30, 2015 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeCases Non-Suited Or Dismissed By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry *****************scan box 2553**************** *****************scan box 2553**************** Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice /Order (Mark Rechner & Silvia Roca) /Order (Mark Rechner & Silvia Roca) Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Non-Suit
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit without Prejudice Notice of Nonsuit Notice of Nonsuit without Prejudice Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order-Sent to Court Order-Sent to Court Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss - No Trial Setting
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Result: Held
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
August 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Letter Setting Hearign for 9-11-15 at 11am Setting Hearign for 9-11-15 at 11am Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Agreed Judgment - sent to court Agreed Judgment - sent to court Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.