Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc Assignee Of Ge Capital Retail Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Rebecca Currier, against Pettijohn, Michael T., in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bridewell, Wayne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBridewell, Wayne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 20, 2015 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order - Order Appointing Receiver - sent to court via que - Order Appointing Receiver - sent to court via que Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Application for the Appointment of a Receiver - sent to court via que - sent to court via que Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry ******************************** SCAN BOX 2503 ****************************** ******************************** SCAN BOX 2503 ****************************** Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice /Judgment (sent to Michael Pettijohn, Rebecca Currier) /Judgment (sent to Michael Pettijohn, Rebecca Currier) Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Bailiff's Certificate of Call
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Docket (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Result: Held
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Default Judgment-Sent to Court Default Judgment-Sent to Court Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Letter mailed to Rebecca Currier & Michael Pettijohn mailed to Rebecca Currier & Michael Pettijohn Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.