Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Durboraw, April, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by D Kimberli Wallace, against Specialized Loan Servicing, Llc, represented by Nathan J Milliron, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Neill, John E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeCases Non-Suited Or Dismissed By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion for Return of Bond Returned from Court Signed on Motion for Return of Bond Returned from Court Signed Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Return of Bond -sent to court via que Motion Motion for Return of Bond -sent to court via que Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order on Motion for Return of Bond -sent to court via que Order on Motion for Return of Bond -sent to court via que Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry ****************scan box 2480***************** ****************scan box 2480***************** Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice sent to Kimberli Wallace, Nathan Milliron sent to Kimberli Wallace, Nathan Milliron Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
February 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Final Summary Judgment Motion Motion for Final Summary Judgment Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
February 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order of Nonsuit-Sent to Court Order of Nonsuit-Sent to Court Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
February 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Suit
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
February 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Final Summary Judgment-Sent to Court-ret Final Summary Judgment-Sent to Court-ret Judge: Neill, John E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.