Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cain & Associates, P.C., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by D Scott Cain, against Morgan, Clinton, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Neill, John E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2014 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Vacating Default Judgment & Dismissal With Prejudice - signed Vacating Default Judgment & Dismissal With Prejudice - signed Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Vacating Default Judgment and Dismissal with Prejudice-Sent to Court Order Vacating Default Judgment and Dismissal with Prejudice-Sent to Court Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Agreed Motion to Vacate Default Judgment and Dismiss with Prejudice Agreed Motion to Vacate Default Judgment and Dismiss with Prejudice Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter re: dissolving Writ of Execution Letter Letter re: dissolving Writ of Execution Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution MORGAN, CLINTON Served 02/17/2016
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Application for a Writ of Execution-Writ Iss-JOCO Application Application for a Writ of Execution-Writ Iss-JOCO Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice SENT TO MARK HINES, CLINTON MORGAN SENT TO MARK HINES, CLINTON MORGAN Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry ***************scan box 2454****************** ***************scan box 2454****************** Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment
Judge: Neill, John E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.