Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc Assignee Of U.S. Bank National Association, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Michael R Castro, against Jack, April N., in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bridewell, Wayne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2014 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Release of Judgment
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry *************************************** SCAN BOX 2503 ****************************** *************************************** SCAN BOX 2503 ****************************** Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Ret Mail- fwd time expired Ret Mail- fwd time expired Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice /judgment (sent to Rebecca Currier, April Jack) /judgment (sent to Rebecca Currier, April Jack) Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Docket (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Result: Held
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Bailiff's Certificate of Call
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Default Judgment-Sent to Court Default Judgment-Sent to Court Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Letter mailed to Michael Castro & April Jack mailed to Michael Castro & April Jack Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.