Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Texas Mutual Insurance Company, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by R Scott Placek, against Davis, Gregory, represented by Wm Randell Johnson, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2014 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Other Injury Or Damage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Case Disposed CANCELED Jury Trial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Case Disposed |
|
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing Case Disposed CANCELED Pre-Trial Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Case Disposed |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Scan Box *****SCAN BOX 3305***** *****SCAN BOX 3305***** |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Other CANCELED Jury Trial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Other |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice /ORDER (Scott Placek, Randel Johnson) /ORDER (Scott Placek, Randel Johnson) |
|
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing Other CANCELED Pre-Trial Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Other |
|
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Agreed Order of Non-Suit | |
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit With Prejudice Joint Notice of Nonsuit with Prejudice - sent to court via que Joint Notice of Nonsuit with Prejudice - sent to court via que |
|
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Amended Motion - Texas Mutual Insurance Company's First Amended No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendant's Conterclaims - Texas Mutual Insurance Company's First Amended No-Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendant's Conterclaims |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.