Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Savage, Shelby Leeann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Abbott, Klay W, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bridewell, Wayne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed No Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter Confirming Hearing ***filed into wrong case, should have been DC-D201700972, will refile into correct case number**** ***filed into wrong case, should have been DC-D201700972, will refile into correct case number**** Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry ************************************ SCAN BOX 2504 ************************* ************************************ SCAN BOX 2504 ************************* Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice /order (sent to Curtis Pritchard) /order (sent to Curtis Pritchard) Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Docket (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Result: Dismissed
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Letter mailed to Curtis Pritchard mailed to Curtis Pritchard Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE/DP 4 pages ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE/DP Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
New Cases Filed (OCA)
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry PMNT FOR COST/DP 0 pages PMNT FOR COST/DP Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.