Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Woodard, Katie Lynn, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Gray, Gus Robert, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2014 |
CategorySupport Order - Iv-D |
Last RefreshedMay 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Conine, Casey Raymond) Zoom Mtg ID# 817 0970 9286 Zoom Mtg ID# 817 0970 9286 |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver of Service | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Issue - PCT 4 Katie Lynn Woodard Katie Lynn Woodard |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Reissue - AG Gus Robert Gray Gus Robert Gray |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation Woodard, Katie Lynn Served 08/31/2020 Returned 09/01/2020 | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation Returned | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation Gray, Gus Robert Unserved | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
(LAC) Reduce Judgment and Modify Support Suit for Modification of Support Order and Motion to Confirm Support Arrearage Suit for Modification of Support Order and Motion to Confirm Support Arrearage |
|
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Establishing the Parent Child Relationship Agreed-Filed 5/7/15 Agreed-Filed 5/7/15 |
|
May 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Holmes, George) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.