Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gentry, Jordan, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Riordan, Kendra Elaine, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bridewell, Wayne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Other ******* Scan Box 2655 ******* ******* Scan Box 2655 ******* Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice (emailed to Stacy Alford, Patrick Barkman, Jeff Cochran) (emailed to Stacy Alford, Patrick Barkman, Jeff Cochran) Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Jeff Cochran's Motion to Strike Pleadings and Dismissing Case Order Order Granting Jeff Cochran's Motion to Strike Pleadings and Dismissing Case Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Pleadings (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Jeff Cochran's Mo. to Strike 10/21/2016 Reset by Court to 11/22/2016 Result: Held Jeff Cochran's Mo. to Strike Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) P. Barkman's Motion to Withdraw Result: Held P. Barkman's Motion to Withdraw Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion to Withdraw Order on Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel Order on Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel Motion Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter to Court Coordinator Letter Letter to Court Coordinator Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing on M/for Withdrawal of Counsel on M/for Withdrawal of Counsel Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.