Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jean, Janice Ann, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Jean, Gary Don, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with William C. Bosworth, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2008 |
CategorySupport Order - Iv-D |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry - Release -*Emailed AG - Release -*Emailed AG |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order - Order for Issuance of Writ of Execution - sent to court - Order for Issuance of Writ of Execution - sent to court |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter Requesting Issuance of Citation(s) Writ of Execution Writ of Execution |
|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Reviving Judgment - signed 12/9/2020 Reviving Judgment - signed 12/9/2020 |
|
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Answer -Respondent's First Amended Answer -Respondent's First Amended Answer |
|
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter Confirming Hearing - December 2, 2020 @2:00p - sent to court via que - December 2, 2020 @2:00p - sent to court via que |
|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned -Returned Executed on 10/12/2020 -Returned Executed on 10/12/2020 |
|
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendant's Original Answer Defendant's Original Answer |
|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Scire Facias - emailed to atty Scire Facias - emailed to atty |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.