Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Johnson County, Hill College, Godley Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by R. Bruce Medley, against Bayview Financial Property Trust, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bosworth, William presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBosworth, William Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2018 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment/Non Jury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Scan Box ***** Scan Box 3601 ***** ***** Scan Box 3601 ***** Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. Judgment of $5,068.43Awarded To: Godley Independent School District, et alAwarded Against: Bayview Financial Property Trust |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. Judgment of $5,068.43Awarded To: Godley Independent School District, et alAwarded Against: Bayview Financial Property Trust |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. Judgment of $5,068.43Awarded To: Godley Independent School District, et alAwarded Against: Bayview Financial Property Trust |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certification of Delinquent Tax Records PLTF'S EXH # 1 PLTF'S EXH # 1 Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. Judgment of $5,068.43Awarded To: Godley Independent School District, et alAwarded Against: Bayview Financial Property Trust |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. Judgment of $5,068.43Awarded To: Godley Independent School District, et alAwarded Against: Bayview Financial Property Trust |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Tax Suit (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Result: Held
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. Judgment of $5,068.43Awarded To: Godley Independent School District, et alAwarded Against: Bayview Financial Property Trust |
|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice/Judgment emailed atty, sent to deft emailed atty, sent to deft Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. Judgment of $5,068.43Awarded To: Godley Independent School District, et alAwarded Against: Bayview Financial Property Trust |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned -Returned Executed on 07/14/2020-Secretary of State Certificate of Service -Returned Executed on 07/14/2020-Secretary of State Certificate of Service Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. Judgment of $5,068.43Awarded To: Godley Independent School District, et alAwarded Against: Bayview Financial Property Trust |
|
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Setting Notice -October 7, 2020 @10:00 a.m. -October 7, 2020 @10:00 a.m. Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. Judgment of $5,068.43Awarded To: Godley Independent School District, et alAwarded Against: Bayview Financial Property Trust |
|
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned EXECUTED 7-14-2020 EXECUTED 7-14-2020 Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. Judgment of $5,068.43Awarded To: Godley Independent School District, et alAwarded Against: Bayview Financial Property Trust |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.