Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Maples, Melissa Michelle, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Murillo, Julian, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with William C. Bosworth, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam C. Bosworth, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 09, 2021 |
CategoryProtective Orders - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedOctober 27, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Protective Order Hearing (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) And Protective Order Result: Held And Protective Order |
|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) And Protective Order And Protective Order |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order on Fourth Joint Motion to Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order Agreed Order Agreed Order on Fourth Joint Motion to Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Extend Ex Parte Protective Order -Fourth Joint Motion to Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order-Sent to court via queue -Fourth Joint Motion to Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order-Sent to court via queue |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Also Including Protective Order Result: Held Also Including Protective Order |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order -Agreed Order on Fourth Joint Motion to Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order-Sent to court via queue -Agreed Order on Fourth Joint Motion to Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order-Sent to court via queue |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order on Third Joint Motion to Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order Agreed Order Agreed Order on Third Joint Motion to Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order Extending Temporary Restraining Order Agreed Order on Third Joint Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order Agreed Order on Third Joint Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Confirming Hearing 10-05-2021 9AM 10-05-2021 9AM |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Including Protective Order Including Protective Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.