Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jernigan, Becky Sue, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Jernigan, Bobby Cain, Bennett, Cassie Diane, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 12, 2021 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedSeptember 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Income Withholding Order for Support | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Order in Suit Affecting the Parent/Child Relationship | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Default hearing (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officers Weeks, John Wilson, Weeks, John Wilson) Result: Held | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned - EXECUTED - 05/14/2021 - EXECUTED - 05/14/2021 |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition in Suit Affecting the Parent-Child Relationship - Iss cits Original Petition in Suit Affecting the Parent-Child Relationship - Iss cits |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued - emailed to atty - emailed to atty |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Indigency Statement of Inability to Afford Court Costs and Attorney Certificate Statement of Inability to Afford Court Costs and Attorney Certificate |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Bennett, Cassie Diane Served 05/14/2021 Returned 05/21/2021 Jernigan, Bobby Cain Served 05/14/2021 Returned 05/21/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.