Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mecca-Mcclory, Christina D., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mcclory, Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bridewell, Wayne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 02, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedMay 27, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment/Non Jury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (2:15 PM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Result: Held
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Default Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Income Withholding Order for Support
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bailiff's Certificate of Call
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address -Attorney's Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address -Attorney's Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Executed on 03/31/2021 Executed on 03/31/2021 Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation McClory, Christopher Served 03/31/2021
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued - emailed to atty - emailed to atty Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.