Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Miskovic, Angela Marie Miskovic, Angela, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Byrd, Bradley Hugh, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 10, 2020 |
CategorySupport Order - Iv-D |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) for clarification of prior order for possession or access Zoom 946 0684 4351 for clarification of prior order for possession or access Zoom 946 0684 4351 |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order - Temporary Orders in Suit Affecting the Parent-Child Relationship - sent to court via que - Temporary Orders in Suit Affecting the Parent-Child Relationship - sent to court via que |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Clarification of Prior Order for Possession or Access - NOH - sent to court via que Motion Motion for Clarification of Prior Order for Possession or Access - NOH - sent to court via que |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Amicus Attorney's Original Answer | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Agreed Order Appointing Amicus Attorney - sent to court via que Agreed Order Appointing Amicus Attorney - sent to court via que |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Order (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Zoom 990 6335 9292 Result: Held Zoom 990 6335 9292 |
|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | DNA Results | |
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter Confirming Hearing - September 10, 2020 @10:00a - sent to court via que - September 10, 2020 @10:00a - sent to court via que |
|
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | E-Mail Correspondence Setting Hearing | |
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Consolidating Suits ** DC-D202000683 to DC-D202000739** ** DC-D202000683 to DC-D202000739** |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.