Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hale, Elma Nadine, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hale, James Edgar, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with William C. Bosworth, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam C. Bosworth, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 18, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Proposed Interim Temporary Orders - Sent to court via que Proposed Interim Temporary Orders - Sent to court via que |
|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Result: Continued | |
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Counter/Cross Petition Original Counterpetition for Divorce Original Counterpetition for Divorce |
|
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Order on Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order | |
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Result: Reset | |
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Power of Attorney Re: James Hale Re: James Hale |
|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order | |
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Answer - Respondent's Original Answer, General Denial and Request for Extension - Respondent's Original Answer, General Denial and Request for Extension |
|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Returned Executed 6/20/20 Executed 6/20/20 |
|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Executed 6/20/2020 Executed 6/20/2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.