Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Grijalva, Leslie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hobbs, Corey Morgan, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with William C. Bosworth, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam C. Bosworth, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) | |
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Dismiss - No Trial Setting | |
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Sheets Ret Signed - Race Trac Ret Signed - Race Trac |
|
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Sheets Race Trac Race Trac |
|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Child Support Card | |
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Garnishment Fee Paid | |
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Income Withholding Order for Support *sent to employer 7/6/20 *sent to employer 7/6/20 |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Bailiff's Certificate of Call | |
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Result: Held | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Issued - emailed to atty - emailed to atty |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.