Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Joslyn, Sheena, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Joslyn Iii, Richard Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Hewlett, Sydney B presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHewlett, Sydney B Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 06, 2019 |
CategoryAll Other Family Law Matters |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment/Non Jury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Scan Box ***** Scan Box 3561 ***** ***** Scan Box 3561 ***** Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order in Suit to Modify the Parent-Child Relationship SENT SENT Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice SENT SENT Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition First Amended Petition to Modify Parent-Child Relationship First Amended Petition to Modify Parent-Child Relationship Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition to Modify Parent-Child Relationship No Cit/TRo No Cit/TRo Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Sheets Ret Signed - Crowley ISD Ret Signed - Crowley ISD Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Sheets Crowley Independent School District Crowley Independent School District Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter to Clerk Fee Paid Fee Paid Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.