Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Strickland, Marty Joel, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Strickland, Bevly Gene, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with McGregor, F. B., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcGregor, F. B., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry ******************scan box 2529*************** ******************scan box 2529*************** Judge: McGregor, F. B., Jr. |
|
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice /Decree (sent to Terri Wilson, not sent to Bevly Strickland due to no current address) /Decree (sent to Terri Wilson, not sent to Bevly Strickland due to no current address) Judge: McGregor, F. B., Jr. |
|
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: McGregor, F. B., Jr. |
|
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: McGregor, F. B., Jr. |
|
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer McGregor, F. B., Jr.) Result: Held
Judge: McGregor, F. B., Jr. |
|
April 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter confimrin hearing for 5-6-16 @ 9:00 am Letter Letter confimrin hearing for 5-6-16 @ 9:00 am Judge: McGregor, F. B., Jr. |
|
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter Requesting Hrg Requesting Hrg Judge: McGregor, F. B., Jr. |
|
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Agreed temporary orders-ret unsigned Agreed temporary orders-ret unsigned Judge: McGregor, F. B., Jr. |
|
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Other CANCELED Temporary Restraining Order (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Other Judge: McGregor, F. B., Jr. |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement
Judge: McGregor, F. B., Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.