Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Hewlett, Sydney B presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHewlett, Sydney B Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 22, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 03, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeAll Other Dispositions |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice sent sent Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Adult Name Change (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officers Weeks, John Wilson, Weeks, John Wilson) Result: Held
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Changing the Name of an Adult
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Setting Hearing 9/2
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Changing the Name of an Adult - put in file Order Changing the Name of an Adult - put in file Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Requesting Hearing put in court file put in court file Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certification of Criminal History Record Information
Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Petition to Change the Name of an Adult Petition to Change the Name of an Adult Judge: Hewlett, Sydney B |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.