Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Roger Kyle Ball, against Mcdonald, William S., in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 18, 2020 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Default hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officers Bridewell, Wayne, Neill, John E.) | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter for Filing for Filing |
|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order - Default Judgment - sent to court via que - Default Judgment - sent to court via que |
|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment - Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment - sent to court via que - Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment - sent to court via que |
|
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned - EXECUTED 6-25-2020 - EXECUTED 6-25-2020 |
|
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation Mcdonald, William S Unserved | |
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued - mailed to abc legal - mailed to abc legal |
|
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter - ABC Legal - ABC Legal |
|
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Plaintiff's Original Petition & First Discovery Requests Plaintiff's Original Petition & First Discovery Requests |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.