Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Birdcreek, Gina Rene, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Birdcreek, Stephen Rea, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bosworth, William presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 04, 1997 |
CategoryAll Other Family Law Matters |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed No Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry ***************SCAN BOX 2497**************** ***************SCAN BOX 2497**************** Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice (sent to Gina Birdcreek, Stephen Birdcreek) (sent to Gina Birdcreek, Stephen Birdcreek) Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Docket (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Result: Dismissed
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Pro Se Motion to Terminate Withholding for child support. Stephen Birdcreek to attend in person, Gina Birdcreek to attend by telephone from Kansas Result: Other Pro Se Motion to Terminate Withholding for child support. Stephen Birdcreek to attend in person, Gina Birdcreek to attend by telephone from Kansas Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
E-Mail Correspondence
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter from Court from Court Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Dismissal Letters Dismissal Letters Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
July 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry ADDRESS FOR EMPLOYER/HOME UPDATE/GM 1 pages ADDRESS FOR EMPLOYER/HOME UPDATE/GM Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.