Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Edcouch Elsa Independent School District, Hidalgo County, Hidalgo County Drainage District #1, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Jonathan Garza, against Beccera, Issac, Beccera, Joel, Garza, Maricela, Muniz, Freddy, Muniz, Jose, (total of 11) See All represented by Barry John Brooks, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Singleterry, Luis M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2014 |
CategoryTax Cases (Oca) |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Judgment Signed
Date: December 08, 2015Intervenor's Exhibit to Judgment
Date: December 07, 2015Order to Substitute Counsel, Signed
Date: November 30, 2015Motion for Substitution of Counsel, Filed
Date: November 25, 2015Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 31, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice OF RULE 306-RETURNED FROM MARICELA GARZA--NO MAIL RECEPTACLE-RETURN TO SENDER OF RULE 306-RETURNED FROM MARICELA GARZA--NO MAIL RECEPTACLE-RETURN TO SENDER Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice OF RULE 306 RETURNED FROM JESUS SAENZ- NOT SERVED OF RULE 306 RETURNED FROM JESUS SAENZ- NOT SERVED Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO: GUDALUPE RAMIREZ, JESSICA SAENZ, ISSAC BECERA, JOEL BECCERA, JESUS SAENZ, JOSE MUNIZ, FREDDY MUNIZ, AND TO MARICELA GARZA BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO: GUDALUPE RAMIREZ, JESSICA SAENZ, ISSAC BECERA, JOEL BECCERA, JESUS SAENZ, JOSE MUNIZ, FREDDY MUNIZ, AND TO MARICELA GARZA Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent BY REGULAR MAIL TO: STATE OF TEXAS BY REGULAR MAIL TO: STATE OF TEXAS Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment Signed
Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Singleterry, Luis M.) Result: Granted
Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Called Attorneys Kelly Rivera Salazar and Hiram Gutierrez present for court hearing. Relief requested Granted. Judgment Granted and signed by Judge Singleterry. Attorneys Kelly Rivera Salazar and Hiram Gutierrez present for court hearing. Relief requested Granted. Judgment Granted and signed by Judge Singleterry. Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Known Address of Defendant LAST KNOWN MAILING ADDRESS LAST KNOWN MAILING ADDRESS Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit EXHIBIT 9 NONMILITARY AFFIDAVIT D8 EXHIBIT 9 NONMILITARY AFFIDAVIT D8 Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Non-Military Affidavit EXHIBIT 8 NONMILITARY AFFIDAVIT D7 EXHIBIT 8 NONMILITARY AFFIDAVIT D7 Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.