Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Edinburg Consolidated Independent School District, Hidalgo County, Hidalgo County Drainage District #1, Mcallen Independent School District, Pharr - San Juan - Alamo Independent School District, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Kelly Rivera Salazar, Thelma R. Banduch, against At&T Advertising Solutions, Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Brown, Esteban Ortega, Compass Bank, Crosspoint Business Center Condominiums, Phase 1 Owners Association, Inc., (total of 20) See All represented by M. Teresa Coronado, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER FOR PARTIAL NON SUIT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryTax Cases (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeNon-Suit |
Order for Partial Non-Suit, Signed
Date: November 15, 2021Proposed Order
Date: November 12, 2021Order for Partial Non-Suit, Signed
Date: October 04, 2021Proposed Order
Date: September 30, 2021Motion for Partial Non-Suit, Filed
Date: September 30, 2021Order for Partial Non-Suit, Signed
Date: September 07, 2021Proposed Order
Date: September 03, 2021Motion for Partial Non-Suit, Filed
Date: September 03, 2021Amended Petition
Date: January 26, 2021Amended Petition
Date: September 30, 2020Order for Partial Non-Suit, Signed
Date: August 13, 2020Proposed Order
Date: August 13, 2020Statement of The Evidence
Date: August 13, 2020Judgment Filed
Date: August 13, 2020Proposed Order
Date: August 12, 2020Motion for Partial Non-Suit, Filed
Date: August 12, 2020Amended Petition
Date: February 12, 2020Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem, Signed
Date: January 31, 2020Proposed Order
Date: December 12, 2019Motion Appointing Attorney Ad Litem
Date: December 12, 2019Proposed Order
Date: September 19, 2019Order for Partial Non-Suit, Signed
Date: September 09, 2019Order of Consolidation, Signed
Date: August 30, 2019Amended Petition
Date: August 27, 2019Proposed Order
Date: August 08, 2019Proposed Order
Date: August 08, 2019Motion for Partial Non-Suit, Filed
Date: August 08, 2019Motion to Consolidate, Filed
Date: August 08, 2019Proposed Order
Date: April 02, 2019Order to Substitute Counsel, Signed
Date: April 02, 2019Motion for Substitution of Counsel, Filed
Date: April 02, 2019Order for Partial Non-Suit, Signed
Date: August 09, 2018Proposed Order
Date: August 09, 2018Motion for Partial Non-Suit, Filed
Date: August 09, 2018Order to Substitute Counsel, Signed
Date: July 07, 2018Order for Partial Non-Suit, Signed
Date: July 07, 2018Amended Petition
Date: July 05, 2018Proposed Order
Date: July 05, 2018Motion for Partial Non-Suit, Filed
Date: July 05, 2018Amended Petition
Date: July 03, 2018Motion for Substitution of Counsel, Filed
Date: July 03, 2018Motion to Consolidate, Filed
Date: July 03, 2018Proposed Order
Date: June 22, 2018Amended Petition
Date: March 02, 2018Amended Petition
Date: December 22, 2016Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 30, 2014Proposed Order
Date: June 17, 2020Proposed Order
Date: June 18, 2020Statement of The Evidence
Date: June 18, 2020Judgment Filed
Date: June 18, 2020Statement of The Evidence
Date: June 17, 2020Judgment Filed
Date: June 17, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Ramon, Israel, Jr.)
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER FOR PARTIAL NON SUIT |
|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order FOR PARTIAL NON-SUIT FOR PARTIAL NON-SUIT Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER FOR PARTIAL NON SUIT |
|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Partial Non-Suit, Filed
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER FOR PARTIAL NON SUIT |
|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue PROPOSED ORDER FOR PARTIAL NON-SUIT PROPOSED ORDER FOR PARTIAL NON-SUIT Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER FOR PARTIAL NON SUIT |
|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Partial Non-Suit, Signed AS TO: Defendant(s) - Hospira Worldwide, Inc. (Lienholder, In Rem Only), C T Corporation System, Registered Agent AS TO: Defendant(s) - Hospira Worldwide, Inc. (Lienholder, In Rem Only), C T Corporation System, Registered Agent Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER FOR PARTIAL NON SUIT |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Disclaimer of Interest
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER FOR PARTIAL NON SUIT |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Returned Unserved
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER FOR PARTIAL NON SUIT |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER FOR PARTIAL NON SUIT |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER FOR PARTIAL NON SUIT |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Re-Setting Hearing
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER FOR PARTIAL NON SUIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.