Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
City Of Alamo, Hidalgo County, Hidalgo County Drainage District # 01, Hidalgo County Drainage District #1, Pharr - San Juan - Alamo Independent School District, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Jonathan Garza, Kelly Rivera Salazar, against Mccutchen, Joe C., in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Singleterry, Luis M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryTax Cases (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Release of Judgment, Filed
Date: October 25, 2018Order of Sale
Date: July 09, 2018Amended Petition
Date: January 18, 2018Order to Substitute Counsel, Signed
Date: March 14, 2017Motion for Substitution of Counsel, Filed
Date: March 14, 2017Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 30, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Returned Undeliverable JOE C. MCCUTCHEN JOE C. MCCUTCHEN Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Returned Undeliverable JOE C. MCCUTCHEN JOE C. MCCUTCHEN Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Release of Judgment, Filed
Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Excess Proceeds
Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Receipt INITIAL DEPOSIT OF EXCESS PROCEEDS INITIAL DEPOSIT OF EXCESS PROCEEDS Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale Returned, Filed
Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale
Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice MCCUTCHEN, JOE C. Returned Unserved 05/18/2018 Returned 05/18/2018
Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of 239a Default Judgment Sent
Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment, Signed
Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.