Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Hidalgo County, Hidalgo County Drainage District # 01, Hidalgo County Drainage District #1, Sharyland Independent School District, South Texas College, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Kelly Rivera Salazar, Thelma R. Banduch, against Alamo Title Company, City Of Mission, Compass Bank, Ditech Financial, Llc, Dizdar, Kelly, (total of 13) See All represented by Joe Virene, John R. Resendez, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Mario E. Ramirez, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryTax Cases (Oca) |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Amended Petition
Date: June 26, 2020Answer
Date: June 25, 2020Amended Petition
Date: May 19, 2020Proposed Order
Date: May 19, 2020Amended Petition
Date: October 11, 2019Amended Petition
Date: August 29, 2018Amended Petition
Date: May 08, 2018Answer
Date: May 10, 2016Amended Petition
Date: March 31, 2016Amended Petition
Date: October 05, 2015Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 30, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Dismissal Want of Prosecution (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Ramirez, Mario E., Jr.) 08/11/2017 Reset by Court to 11/03/2017 11/03/2017 Reset by Court to 02/09/2018 02/09/2018 Reset by Court to 05/11/2018 05/11/2018 Reset by Court to 08/17/2018 08/17/2018 Reset by Court to 11/16/2018 11/16/2018 Reset by Court to 03/01/2019 03/01/2019 Reset by Court to 10/11/2019 10/11/2019 Reset by Court to 12/13/2019 12/13/2019 Reset by Court to 06/19/2020 06/19/2020 Reset by Court to 08/21/2020 | |
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing ATTY BRIAN E. WATERS ATTY BRIAN E. WATERS |
|
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition SEVENTH AMENDED SEVENTH AMENDED |
|
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation Issued |
|
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Tax Citation - Out of County (Fee) | |
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Service | |
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Tax Citation - Out of County ALAMO TITLE COMPANY Unserved | |
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer | |
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing ATTY JOHN RESENDEZ ATTY JOHN RESENDEZ |
|
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter Received RESETTING HEARING CONFIRMATION RESETTING HEARING CONFIRMATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.