Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Isd, Mcallen, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Thelma R. Banduch, against Sotelo Enterprises, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Juan R. Partida presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryTax Cases (Oca) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF NON-SUIT, SIGNED (ONS) Order of Non-Suit, Signed ORDER OF NON-SUIT, SIGNED (ONS) |
|
June 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Disposition ($DISP) ($DISP) |
|
June 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (8:57 AM) (Judicial Officer Partida, Juan) | |
June 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Defendants Privilege Log Global Disposition: Defendants Privilege Log Global Disposition: Defendants Privilege Log |
|
June 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Called T-2883-09-E 06/09/2011 CASE CALLED NON-SUITED ORDER SIGNED CASE CALLED (CC) T-2883-09-E 06/09/2011 CASE CALLED NON-SUITED ORDER SIGNED CASE CALLED (CC) |
|
June 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion for Non-Suit, Filed T-2883-09-E 06/07/2011 MOTION FOR NON-SUIT, MCALLEN ISD MOTION FOR NON-SUIT, FILED. (MFNS) T-2883-09-E 06/07/2011 MOTION FOR NON-SUIT, MCALLEN ISD MOTION FOR NON-SUIT, FILED. (MFNS) |
|
June 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer T-2883-09-E 06/29/2010 ANSWER OSCAR SOTELO, II, FILED (FILED ON 6-24-10) ANSWER (ANS) T-2883-09-E 06/29/2010 ANSWER OSCAR SOTELO, II, FILED (FILED ON 6-24-10) ANSWER (ANS) |
|
June 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned T-2883-09-E 06/03/2010 CITATION RETURNED FROM SOTELO ENTERPRISES, SERVED ON 6-1-10, FILED (FILED ON 6-2-10) CITATION RETURNED (CIT.R) T-2883-09-E 06/03/2010 CITATION RETURNED FROM SOTELO ENTERPRISES, SERVED ON 6-1-10, FILED (FILED ON 6-2-10) CITATION RETURNED (CIT.R) |
|
May 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued T-2883-09-E 05/26/2010 CITATION ISSUED TO SOTELO ENTERPRISES, L.L.C. CITATION ISSUED (CIT.I) Citation Issued T-2883-09-E 05/26/2010 CITATION ISSUED TO SOTELO ENTERPRISES, L.L.C. CITATION ISSUED (CIT.I) |
|
January 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned T-2883-09-E 01/12/2010 CITATION RETURNED FROM SOTELO ENTERPRISES, LLC NOT SERVED, FILED (FILED ON 1.11.10) CITATION RETURNED (CIT.R) T-2883-09-E 01/12/2010 CITATION RETURNED FROM SOTELO ENTERPRISES, LLC NOT SERVED, FILED (FILED ON 1.11.10) CITATION RETURNED (CIT.R) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.