Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Hidalgo County, Et. Al., filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Thelma R. Banduch, against Lopez, Manny, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Aida Salinas Flores presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryTax Cases (Oca) |
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Release of Judgment, Filed
Date: October 11, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Release of Judgment, Filed | |
July 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Release of Judgment, Filed | |
May 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment Signed JUDGMENT, SIGNED (JS) JUDGMENT, SIGNED (JS) |
|
May 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Salinas Flores, Aida) | |
May 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Called T-2876-09-I 05/03/2011 CASE CALLED GUS HERNANDEZ AND HIRAM GUTIERREZ APPRD; JUDICIAL NOTICE TAKEN; EXHIBITS ADMITTED; JUDGMENT SIGNED/ESC CASE CALLED (CC) T-2876-09-I 05/03/2011 CASE CALLED GUS HERNANDEZ AND HIRAM GUTIERREZ APPRD; JUDICIAL NOTICE TAKEN; EXHIBITS ADMITTED; JUDGMENT SIGNED/ESC CASE CALLED (CC) |
|
May 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Disposition ($DISP) ($DISP) |
|
February 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Resetting Hearing Date, Signed T-2876-09-I 02/10/2011 ORDER RESETTING HEAR BY JDG. ASF; FINAL HRNG. SET FOR 5-03-11 @ 8:30AM; CGJ ORDER RESETTING HEARING DATE, SIGNED (ORHD) T-2876-09-I 02/10/2011 ORDER RESETTING HEAR BY JDG. ASF; FINAL HRNG. SET FOR 5-03-11 @ 8:30AM; CGJ ORDER RESETTING HEARING DATE, SIGNED (ORHD) |
|
November 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing T-2876-09-I 11/10/2010 ORDER SETTING HEARIN FINAL HRG SET FOR 2-15-11 @ 8:30 AM/ESC ORDER SETTING HEARING SIGNED (OSHS) T-2876-09-I 11/10/2010 ORDER SETTING HEARIN FINAL HRG SET FOR 2-15-11 @ 8:30 AM/ESC ORDER SETTING HEARING SIGNED (OSHS) |
|
November 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Salinas Flores, Aida) | |
November 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Called T-2876-09-I 11/10/2010 CASE CALLED JONATHAN GARZA, RESPONDENT MANNY LOPEZ AND MIKE CANO APPRD; FINAL HRG RESET FOR 2-15-11 @ 8:30 AM/ESC CASE CALLED (CC) T-2876-09-I 11/10/2010 CASE CALLED JONATHAN GARZA, RESPONDENT MANNY LOPEZ AND MIKE CANO APPRD; FINAL HRG RESET FOR 2-15-11 @ 8:30 AM/ESC CASE CALLED (CC) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.