Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hidalgo County, Et. Al., filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Thelma R. Banduch, against Rodriguez, Guillermo, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Rodolfo Delgado presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2009 |
CategoryTax Cases (Oca) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF NON-SUIT, SIGNED (ONS) Order of Non-Suit, Signed ORDER OF NON-SUIT, SIGNED (ONS) |
|
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Defendants Privilege Log Global Disposition: Defendants Privilege Log Global Disposition: Defendants Privilege Log |
|
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Disposition ($DISP) ($DISP) |
|
August 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Delgado, Rodolfo "Rudy") Result: No Show | |
August 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR NON-SUIT OF INTERVENOR'S CLAIM, SIGNED (ORD.INTER) Order for Non-Suit of Intervenor's Claim, Signed ORDER FOR NON-SUIT OF INTERVENOR'S CLAIM, SIGNED (ORD.INTER) Vol./Book 105, Page 340 |
|
August 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion for Non-Suit, Filed T-2853-09-B 08/16/2011 MOTION FOR NON-SUIT, PERDUE MOTION FOR NON-SUIT, FILED. (MFNS) T-2853-09-B 08/16/2011 MOTION FOR NON-SUIT, PERDUE MOTION FOR NON-SUIT, FILED. (MFNS) |
|
August 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR NON-SUIT OF INTERVENOR'S CLAIMS, FILED (MOT.INTER) Motion for Non-Suit of Intervenor's Claims MOTION FOR NON-SUIT OF INTERVENOR'S CLAIMS, FILED (MOT.INTER) |
|
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Costing Note T-2853-09-B 01/26/2011 COURT COST/$0.00/WAI PAID IN FULL COURT COST/$0.00/WAIVED/REFUND (C/C) T-2853-09-B 01/26/2011 COURT COST/$0.00/WAI PAID IN FULL COURT COST/$0.00/WAIVED/REFUND (C/C) |
|
January 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order Resetting Hearing Date, Signed T-2853-09-B 01/14/2011 ORDER RESETTING HEAR 8/17/11 @ 9:00 AM ORDER RESETTING HEARING DATE, SIGNED (ORHD) T-2853-09-B 01/14/2011 ORDER RESETTING HEAR 8/17/11 @ 9:00 AM ORDER RESETTING HEARING DATE, SIGNED (ORHD) |
|
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Delgado, Rodolfo "Rudy") Result: Reset |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.