Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
City Of Edinburg, Edinburg Consolidated Independent School District, Edinburg Consolidated Independent School District, Et Al, Hidalgo County, Hidalgo County Drainage District # 01, (total of 8) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Hiram A. Gutierrez, Kelly Rivera Salazar, against Vasquez, Deceased, Laura E., Vasquez, Raymundo, represented by Christopher Paul Cavazos, Jose E Garcia, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Ramon, Israel, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRamon, Israel, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 14, 2013 |
CategoryTax Cases (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Proposed Order
Date: September 08, 2021Statement of The Evidence
Date: September 08, 2021Judgment Filed
Date: September 08, 2021Proposed Order
Date: June 09, 2021Statement of The Evidence
Date: June 09, 2021Proposed Order
Date: May 26, 2021Motion to Vacate, Filed
Date: May 26, 2021Statement of The Evidence
Date: April 09, 2021Final Judgment, Signed
Date: April 09, 2021Proposed Order
Date: April 07, 2021Statement of The Evidence
Date: April 07, 2021Judgment Filed
Date: April 07, 2021Statement of The Evidence
Date: January 20, 2021Judgment Filed
Date: January 20, 2021Statement of The Evidence
Date: January 20, 2021Proposed Order
Date: November 13, 2020Statement of The Evidence
Date: November 13, 2020Judgment Filed
Date: November 13, 2020Statement of The Evidence
Date: November 12, 2020Judgment Filed
Date: November 12, 2020Order for Continuance, Signed
Date: November 13, 2020Proposed Order
Date: November 12, 2020Proposed Order
Date: November 12, 2020Answer
Date: November 12, 2020Motion
Date: November 12, 2020Proposed Order
Date: February 18, 2020Motion Appointing Attorney Ad Litem
Date: February 18, 2020Motion for Substitution of Counsel, Filed
Date: April 02, 2019Answer
Date: February 01, 2017Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem, Signed
Date: February 26, 2020Order to Substitute Counsel, Signed
Date: March 10, 2016Proposed Order
Date: April 02, 2019Original Petition (OCA)
Date: November 14, 2013Order to Substitute Counsel, Signed
Date: August 10, 2016Motion for Substitution of Counsel, Filed
Date: August 08, 2016Motion for Substitution of Counsel, Filed
Date: March 10, 2016Judgment Filed
Date: June 09, 2021Statement of The Evidence
Date: June 09, 2021Proposed Order
Date: June 09, 2021Order to Vacate Judgment, Signed
Date: May 26, 2021Answer
Date: March 16, 2020Order to Substitute Counsel, Signed
Date: April 02, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Resetting Hearing Date, Signed
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Ramon, Israel, Jr.)
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue PROPOSED ORDER RESETTING HEARING PROPOSED ORDER RESETTING HEARING Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Re-Setting Hearing
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Returned Judgment filed 9/8/21 to Clerk. Judgment NOT signed. Case reset. Returned Judgment filed 9/8/21 to Clerk. Judgment NOT signed. Case reset. Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Called C/R Velma Arellano; Reset to 11.4.21 @ 1:00 pm. C/R Velma Arellano; Reset to 11.4.21 @ 1:00 pm. Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Ramon, Israel, Jr.)
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order APPROVING FEES APPROVING FEES Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Statement of The Evidence EXHIBIT 3 EXHIBIT 3 Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.