Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Edinburg Consolidated Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Michael G. Cano, against Francis Strickler And All Unknown Heirs, Strickler, Dixie S., Strickler, Francis C., represented by Veronica Moncivais, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Cuellar, Marla presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryTax Cases (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Release of Judgment, Filed
Date: March 16, 2023Order of Sale Returned, Filed
Date: April 19, 2021Order of Sale Issued
Date: December 30, 2020Notice Returned Unserved
Date: November 12, 2020Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Date: October 22, 2020Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Date: October 22, 2020Notice of 239a Default Judgment Sent
Date: October 22, 2020Statement of Evidence, Signed
Date: October 20, 2020Order Approving Fee for Attorney Ad Litem, Signed
Date: October 20, 2020Final Judgment, Signed
Date: October 20, 2020Certification of Delinquent Tax Records
Date: October 20, 2020Certificate of Last Known Address of Defendant
Date: October 19, 2020Non-Military Affidavit
Date: October 19, 2020Certification of Delinquent Tax Records
Date: October 19, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: July 02, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: July 02, 2020Notice Sent
Date: July 01, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: April 15, 2020Order Resetting Hearing Date, Signed
Date: July 01, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: April 15, 2020Notice Sent
Date: April 14, 2020Order to Substitute Counsel, Signed
Date: April 13, 2020Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: March 25, 2020Order Re-Setting Hearing
Date: March 25, 2020Notice
Date: March 10, 2020Notice
Date: March 10, 2020Notice Sent
Date: March 06, 2020Order Setting Hearing
Date: March 03, 2020Amended Petition
Date: February 20, 2020Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: March 06, 2020Proposed Order
Date: November 26, 2019Tax - Plea of Intervention (Fee)
Date: August 29, 2018Notice Sent
Date: August 16, 2018Motion for Substitution of Counsel, Filed
Date: November 26, 2019Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem, Signed
Date: August 16, 2018Motion Appointing Attorney Ad Litem
Date: August 10, 2018Proposed Order
Date: August 10, 2018Affidavit
Date: April 25, 2018Affidavit
Date: April 25, 2018Request for Service
Date: December 28, 2016Answer
Date: January 26, 2017Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 28, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Release of Judgment, Filed
Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale Returned, Filed
Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale Issued
Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Returned Unserved NOTICE OF RULE 306 NOTICE OF RULE 306 Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent EFILED EFILED Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent MAILED MAILED Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of 239a Default Judgment Sent
Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Signed ORDER APPROVING FEE FOR ATTORNEY AD LITEM.DG ORDER APPROVING FEE FOR ATTORNEY AD LITEM.DG Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice FRANCIS STRICKLER AND ALL UNKNOWN HEIRS Served 11/03/2020 Returned 11/04/2020
Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
|
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice FRANCIS STRICKLER AND ALL UNKNOWN HEIRS Unserved
Judge: Cuellar, Marla |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.