Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ovation Services, Llc, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Stephen Dittlinger, against Carrillo, Elizabeth, The United States Of America, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2019 |
CategoryTax Cases (Oca) |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Release of Judgment, Filed
Date: November 04, 2021Order of Sale Issued
Date: November 02, 2021Order of Sale Issued
Date: February 19, 2021Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Date: January 15, 2021Notice of 239a Default Judgment Sent
Date: January 15, 2021Final Judgment, Signed
Date: January 14, 2021Intervenor's Exhibit to Judgment
Date: January 14, 2021Judgment Filed
Date: January 14, 2021Judgment Filed
Date: January 13, 2021Tax - Plea of Intervention (Fee)
Date: January 13, 2021Notice Of Filing Of Business Records
Date: January 07, 2021Affidavit of Fees - Exhibit to Judgment
Date: January 07, 2021Affidavit
Date: January 07, 2021Affidavit
Date: January 07, 2021Notice Sent
Date: October 14, 2020Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: October 14, 2020Order Setting Hearing
Date: October 08, 2020Citation Issued
Date: September 01, 2020Order Granting Motion for Substituted Service, Signed
Date: August 31, 2020Request for Service
Date: August 31, 2020Proposed Order
Date: August 31, 2020Motion for Substitute Service, Filed
Date: August 31, 2020Answer
Date: February 25, 2020Tax - Affidavit of Service
Date: January 13, 2020Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 16, 2019Proposed Order
Date: January 14, 2021Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 16, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale Returned, Filed
Judge: Flores, Bobby |
|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Release of Judgment, Filed
Judge: Flores, Bobby |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale Issued
Judge: Flores, Bobby |
|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale CARRILLO, ELIZABETH Served 03/15/2022 Returned 11/29/2022
Judge: Flores, Bobby |
|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale Returned, Filed
Judge: Flores, Bobby |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale CARRILLO, ELIZABETH Served 07/14/2021 Returned 07/23/2021
Judge: Flores, Bobby |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Sale Issued
Judge: Flores, Bobby |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Judge: Flores, Bobby |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of 239a Default Judgment Sent
Judge: Flores, Bobby |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice CARRILLO, ELIZABETH Served 01/21/2021 Returned 01/22/2021
Judge: Flores, Bobby |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.