Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
City Of Pharr, Hidalgo County, Hidalgo County Drainage District # 01, Hidalgo Independent School District, South Texas College, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Michael G. Cano, against Ontiveros , America Alexandra, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Jaime E. Tijerina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJaime E. Tijerina Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2019 |
CategoryTax Cases (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeNon-Suit |
Motion for Non-Suit
Date: June 29, 2021Citation Issued
Date: September 18, 2019Order for Non-Suit, Signed
Date: July 06, 2021Original Petition (OCA)
Date: September 12, 2019Request for Service
Date: September 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Judge: Ramirez, Joe |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Non-Suit, Signed
Judge: Ramirez, Joe |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Non-Suit
Judge: Ramirez, Joe |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue PROPOSED ORDER FOR NONSUIT PROPOSED ORDER FOR NONSUIT Judge: Ramirez, Joe |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER FOR NONSUIT ORDER FOR NONSUIT Judge: Ramirez, Joe |
|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Tickler (6:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Tijerina, Jaime)
Judge: Ramirez, Joe |
|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation Issued Judge: Ramirez, Joe |
|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Service
Judge: Ramirez, Joe |
|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Tax Citation - HCSO Ontiveros , America Alexandra Served 09/24/2019 Returned 09/27/2019
Judge: Ramirez, Joe |
|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Tax Citation - HCSO (Fee)
Judge: Ramirez, Joe |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.